MN HF2070 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Becker-Finn
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Becker-Finn
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State bee established, and money appropriated.
Title
State bee established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2019-03-20 | House | Authors added Mariani and Lee |
2019-03-14 | House | Authors added Xiong, T.; Christensen; Bierman; and Morrison |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-13 | House | Authors added Dehn and Lippert |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Lillie, Pinto, and Schultz |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2142 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance