MN HF247 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor's action Pocket Veto Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Governor's action Pocket Veto Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State and local government finance provisions changed relating to income and corporate, property, sales and use, mineral, and miscellaneous taxes; and other provisions changed relating to local development, estate taxes, and homestead market value cleanup; and money appropriated.
Title
State and local government finance provisions changed relating to income and corporate, property, sales and use, mineral, and miscellaneous taxes; and other provisions changed relating to local development, estate taxes, and homestead market value cleanup; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - Repassage (Y: 73 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Davnie motion - Refuse to Adopt (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - Passage (Y: 113 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Davnie motion - Refuse to Adopt (Y: 58 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - Passage (Y: 113 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Governor's action Pocket Veto Chapter 296 | |
2012-05-11 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Third reading vote: 41-24 |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-09 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-05-09 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-09 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 41-24 |
2012-05-09 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 73-56 |
2012-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-05-09 | House | House adopted conference committee report question recurred |
2012-05-09 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 58-72 |
2012-05-09 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2012-05-09 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2012-05-09 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-05-09 | House | Senate conferees Ortman, Limmer, Michel |
2012-05-09 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate conferees Ortman; Limmer; Michel |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed |
2011-05-21 | Senate | House conferees Davids; Anderson, S.; Loon |
2011-05-21 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-20 | House | House conferees Davids; Anderson, S.; Loon |
2011-05-20 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2011-05-20 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 51-9 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF872 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2011-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 113-16 |
2011-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2011-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-02 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-03-28 | House | Author added Vogel |
2011-02-24 | House | Author added Westrom |
2011-01-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |