MN HF2500 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Author stricken Atkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Author stricken Atkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Debt settlement services agreements laws changed.
Title
Debt settlement services agreements laws changed.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Sanders [R] | Sen. Branden Petersen [R] | Rep. Diane Anderson [R] | Rep. Pat Mazorol [R] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | House | Author stricken Atkins |
2012-04-16 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-08 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-08 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2012-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2500&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2500&version=0&session=ls87 |