MN HF2638 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 259 05/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 259 05/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Portable electronics insurance sale regulated.
Title
Portable electronics insurance sale regulated.
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Anderson [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Tim Sanders [R] |
Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Secretary of State Chapter 259 05/01/12 | |
2012-05-01 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-04-27 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-04-26 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2310 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-03-27 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 133-0 |
2012-03-27 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-03-27 | House | Amended |
2012-03-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-15 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |