MN HF2881 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 300
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Railroad employees motor carriers regulation amended, and penalties imposed.
Title
Railroad employees motor carriers regulation amended, and penalties imposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. John Ward [D] | Rep. Mary Sawatzky [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] |
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Sen. James Carlson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-16 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 77 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 79 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 79 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 300 | |
2014-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 77-50 |
2014-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-16 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed as amended vote: 53-10 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reconsidered Adoption of amendment |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Reconsidered Third Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 54-9 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2570 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2570, now on General Orders |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-05-06 | House | Bill was passed vote: 79-47 |
2014-05-06 | House | Third reading |
2014-05-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 6, 2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-29 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2014-04-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-04-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2014-04-02 | House | Author added Davnie |
2014-03-27 | House | Author stricken Beard |
2014-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy |