MN HF2884 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Author added Rosenthal.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Author added Rosenthal.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urban Initiative Board and related programs changes made, state access to the program provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Urban Initiative Board and related programs changes made, state access to the program provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] | Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Author added Rosenthal. |
2016-03-24 | House | Author added Simonson. |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2437 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance