MN HF2913 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employers prohibited from requiring disclosure of past wages, and civil penalties imposed.
Title
Employers prohibited from requiring disclosure of past wages, and civil penalties imposed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Author added Moran. |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Maye Quade. |
2018-02-22 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2716 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy