MN HF293 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Erickson and Boe
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Authors added Erickson and Boe
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lawful gambling combined net receipts rates adjusted.
Title
Lawful gambling combined net receipts rates adjusted.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. John Persell [D] |
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] |
Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Authors added Erickson and Boe |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Drazkowski |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-02-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF371 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Author added Eken