MN HF2967 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Equalizing factors and threshold rates updated to reflect the changed adjusted net tax capacity tax base, education and human services appropriations updated for changes reflected in the February forecast, veterans job-training program provided for, supplemental budget appropriations provided, disposition of fees modified, newborn screening provisions modified, Housing Finance Agency provisions modified, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Equalizing factors and threshold rates updated to reflect the changed adjusted net tax capacity tax base, education and human services appropriations updated for changes reflected in the February forecast, veterans job-training program provided for, supplemental budget appropriations provided, disposition of fees modified, newborn screening provisions modified, Housing Finance Agency provisions modified, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - Repassage, as amended by the Senate (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - Thissen motion - Refuse to Concur (Y: 58 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - Thissen motion - Refuse to Concur (Y: 58 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 74 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - Amendment (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 292 | |
2012-05-10 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-05-07 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 131-0 |
2012-05-07 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion prevailed |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments question recurred |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 58-73 |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion to refuse to concur |
2012-05-07 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2012-05-07 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2012-05-07 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2558 |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-04-24 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 74-56 |
2012-04-24 | House | House rule 2.05, member excused from voting Kriesel |
2012-04-24 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-24 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2012-04-24 | House | Amended |
2012-04-23 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Tuesday, April 24, 2012 |
2012-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2012-04-23 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |