MN HF3156 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-17 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-17 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; correctional facility daily population data published on website; occupancy limits of correctional facility cells modified; storage, uniform consent form, and website database for sexual assault examination kits provided; motor vehicle charges and conviction data report provided; early conditional release provided for certain inmates during public health emergency; public safety specialists testing provided; task force established on sentencing for aiding and abetting felony murder; and reports required.
Title
COVID-19; correctional facility daily population data published on website; occupancy limits of correctional facility cells modified; storage, uniform consent form, and website database for sexual assault examination kits provided; motor vehicle charges and conviction data report provided; early conditional release provided for certain inmates during public health emergency; public safety specialists testing provided; task force established on sentencing for aiding and abetting felony murder; and reports required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 76 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: 0 - Amendment as amended - Nays (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - House: 0 - Amendment as amended - Nays (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-17 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-05-16 | House | Amended |
2020-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-14 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended Saturday, May 16, 2020 |
2020-05-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-11 | House | Committee report, re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |