MN HF3395 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Author added Masin.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Author added Masin.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Airports Commission exempted from political subdivision compensation limit.
Title
Metropolitan Airports Commission exempted from political subdivision compensation limit.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. Linda Runbeck [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Author added Masin. |
2018-04-30 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-30 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3525 |
2018-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3525 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 120 05/08/18