MN HF3398 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health commissioner use of all-payer claims data to analyze health care costs, quality, utilization, and illness burdens date restriction changed; and definitions added.
Title
Health commissioner use of all-payer claims data to analyze health care costs, quality, utilization, and illness burdens date restriction changed; and definitions added.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-03 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2675 |
2018-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed