MN HF3423 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Water quality standards for perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances funding provided, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Title
Water quality standards for perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances funding provided, rulemaking authorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Sandell [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
Rep. Anne Claflin [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-05-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2020-05-04 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-05-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Water Division |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Claflin |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3401 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance