MN HF3441 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fugitive emission standards exemption provided for commodity facilities.
Title
Fugitive emission standards exemption provided for commodity facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Bud Nornes [R] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-02 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3182 |
2018-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3182 (Similar To) 2018-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 132 05/14/18