MN HF3443 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Patient health record release requirements modified.
Title
Patient health record release requirements modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-19 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4199 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Second reading