MN HF347 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Author added Huot
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Single entities ownership of a cocktail room and taproom license permitted.
Title
Single entities ownership of a cocktail room and taproom license permitted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-04-26 | House | Authors added Moller and Heinrich |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Fischer |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF158 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy