MN HF3541 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Agbaje
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Author added Agbaje
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis; homeless shelter renovation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis; homeless shelter renovation funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] |
Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2024-03-21 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Noor |
2024-02-13 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF3903 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to Capital Investment