MN HF3556 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum time for school lunch required.
Title
Minimum time for school lunch required.
Sponsors
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] |
Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] | Rep. Liz Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2024-03-14 | House | Authors added Feist and Hanson, J. |
2024-02-15 | House | Author added Youakim |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |