MN HF3565 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Koznick
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Certified salt applicator program established, liability limited, and report required.
Title
Certified salt applicator program established, liability limited, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Author added Koznick |
2024-02-22 | House | Authors added Acomb and Rarick |
2024-02-19 | House | Authors added Hanson, J.; and Brand |
2024-02-15 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-02-13 | House | Authors added Pursell; Curran; Kraft; Hemmingsen-Jaegar |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3954 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy