MN HF3769 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corporate franchise tax provisions modified; effective date modified of a reduction in the limitation on the deductibility of net operating losses.
Title
Corporate franchise tax provisions modified; effective date modified of a reduction in the limitation on the deductibility of net operating losses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3769 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3769 (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Secretary of State Chapter 82 | |
2024-04-08 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-04-08 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-04-08 | Governor approval | |
2024-04-05 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3774 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3774, now on General Orders |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-03-18 | House | Third reading |
2024-03-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 18, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-02-19 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2024-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3774 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3769, SF indefinitely postponed