MN HF3812 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Immunity provided for individuals assisting another to seek medical assistance for drug-related overdose.
Title
Immunity provided for individuals assisting another to seek medical assistance for drug-related overdose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt without further recommendation |
2024-03-04 | House | Authors added Myers and Zeleznikar |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Youakim |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Engen |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3866 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Author added Pha