MN HF4044 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor's bill making miscellaneous technical corrections.
Title
Revisor's bill making miscellaneous technical corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 83 | |
2020-05-16 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-16 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-16 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-13 | House | Returned from Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-09 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-09 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 9, 2020 |
2020-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3948 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Chief author added Limmer