MN HF4079 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Brand
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Brand
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Annual observance for 1st Minnesota Day established.
Title
Annual observance for 1st Minnesota Day established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Brand |
2024-02-26 | House | Authors added Coulter and Schultz |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3950 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans