MN HF4180 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Perchloroethylene use prohibited as dry cleaning solvent, prior appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Perchloroethylene use prohibited as dry cleaning solvent, prior appropriations modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3444 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Authors added Tomassoni; Jasinski