MN HF4211 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health plan coverage of vasectomies required.
Title
Health plan coverage of vasectomies required.
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Liz Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Author added Lee, K. |
2024-02-28 | House | Author added Xiong |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4089 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Author added Boldon