MN HF4334 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans; veteran's preference provisions modified, state benefits prohibited when veterans and former service members forfeit federal benefits, veterans home administrators oversight modified, and new state veterans cemetery planning required.
Title
Veterans; veteran's preference provisions modified, state benefits prohibited when veterans and former service members forfeit federal benefits, veterans home administrators oversight modified, and new state veterans cemetery planning required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Amended |
2024-04-02 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 4, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4539 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans