MN HF4471 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Author added Hanson, J.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Good Acre grant funding provided for the Local Emergency Assistance Farmer Fund program to assist emerging farmers, and money appropriated.
Title
Good Acre grant funding provided for the Local Emergency Assistance Farmer Fund program to assist emerging farmers, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Pérez-Vega |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Her |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4738 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Author added Kunesh