MN HF4591 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Virnig
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Author added Virnig
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protective agent license made necessary for private companies to transport prisoners, license revocation required for acts committed by a licensee or employee of a licensee, and minimum administrative penalty required for violations.
Title
Protective agent license made necessary for private companies to transport prisoners, license revocation required for acts committed by a licensee or employee of a licensee, and minimum administrative penalty required for violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] |
Rep. Elliott Engen [R] | Rep. Bianca Virnig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Virnig |
2024-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-18 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Engen |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4994 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety