MN HF4666 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public employees police and fire retirement plan; postretirement adjustment increased, and waiting period for postretirement adjustment decreased.
Title
Public employees police and fire retirement plan; postretirement adjustment increased, and waiting period for postretirement adjustment decreased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Rehm |
2024-03-25 | House | Author added Clardy |
2024-03-20 | House | Author added Fischer |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Tabke |
2024-03-11 | House | Authors added Huot; Lillie; Hill; Norris; Hicks |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4878 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans