MN HF473 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Preferred incontinence program for medical assistance repealed.
Title
Preferred incontinence program for medical assistance repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Heintzeman |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added McDonald and Cantrell |
2019-01-31 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF491 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Author added Jensen