MN HF4984 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Committee on Library of Congress of United States Congress requested to approve replacement of statue of Henry Mower Rice now on display in National Statuary Hall in the United States Capitol, and memorial resolution proposed.
Title
Joint Committee on Library of Congress of United States Congress requested to approve replacement of statue of Henry Mower Rice now on display in National Statuary Hall in the United States Capitol, and memorial resolution proposed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Nathan Coulter [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] |
Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-18 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2024-03-20 | House | Authors added Coulter and Stephenson |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
SF5360 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans