MN HF52 | 2021 | 92nd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capital improvement projects prior appropriations modified.
Title
Capital improvement projects prior appropriations modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 9 | |
2021-06-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-06-30 | Governor approval | |
2021-06-29 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-06-29 | House | Returned from Senate |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Taken from table |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-06-26 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-06-26 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-06-26 | House | Amended |
2021-06-25 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-06-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, June 26, 2021 |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading |
2021-06-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF39 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Author added Pappas