MN HF5274 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Horse racing; advance deposit wagering conduct, card playing, and pari-mutel betting provided; historical horse racing and other games authorization prohibited; definitions provided; and clarifying and conforming changes made.
Title
Horse racing; advance deposit wagering conduct, card playing, and pari-mutel betting provided; historical horse racing and other games authorization prohibited; definitions provided; and clarifying and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Melissa Hortman [D] | Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2024-04-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-04-11 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-04-09 | House | Author added Davids |
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Long |
2024-04-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5354 (Similar To) 2024-04-30 - Second reading