MN HF5350 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Gas or oil exploration and production leases and permits on state-owned land provided, advisory committee created, rulemaking authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Gas or oil exploration and production leases and permits on state-owned land provided, advisory committee created, rulemaking authorized, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2024-04-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-24 | House | Author added Skraba |
2024-04-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF5048 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance