MN HF63 | 2021 | 92nd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus public safety bill.
Title
Omnibus public safety bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 77 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: Appeal the Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: Appeal the Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 71 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 71 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 63 - Amendment to Nash Amendment - Nays (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate: Bill passed (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate: Amended (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: Appeal the Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: Appeal the Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 71 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 71 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 63 - Amendment to Nash Amendment - Nays (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate: Bill passed (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate: Amended (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Secretary of State Chapter 11 | |
2021-06-30 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-06-30 | Governor approval | |
2021-06-30 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Bill passed |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Taken from table |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Amendment reconsidered and withdrawn |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Reconsidered (Third Reading) |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Third reading |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Amended |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-06-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-06-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-06-29 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken multiple points order |
2021-06-29 | House | Amended |
2021-06-28 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, June 29, 2021 |
2021-06-27 | House | Second reading |
2021-06-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-06-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |