MN HF662 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Author added Davis
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Author added Davis
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.
Title
Right to carry without a permit provided, and optional permit to carry provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Shane Mekeland [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. John Burkel [R] | Rep. Ben Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Davis |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Burkel |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF88 (Similar To) 2023-01-12 - Author added Anderson