MN HF721 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Individual income tax provisions modified, and working family credit expanded.
Title
Individual income tax provisions modified, and working family credit expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-02-01 | House | Author added Brand |
2023-01-30 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-01-25 | House | Authors added Sencer-Mura, Wolgamott, Kotyza-Witthuhn, and Tabke |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |