MN HF743 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription medication payment modified.
Title
Prescription medication payment modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1907 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy