MN HF877 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Author added Berg
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Author added Berg
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation sparsity revenue percent updated.
Title
Transportation sparsity revenue percent updated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Author added Berg |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Edelson |
2023-02-02 | House | Author added West |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF319 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Author added Kreun