MN SF1098 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 78 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription Drug Pricing Transparency Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Pricing Transparency Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15 Secretary of State Chapter 78 05/12/2020
2020-05-15 Governor's action Approval 05/12/2020
2020-05-12 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-12 Governor approval
2020-05-12 Presented to Governor
2020-05-11SenateReturned from House
2020-05-09HouseBill was passed
2020-05-09HouseThird reading
2020-05-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 9, 2020
2020-05-05HouseSecond reading
2020-05-05HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2020-04-28HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
2020-04-28HouseReceived from Senate
2020-04-20SenateThird reading Passed
2020-04-20SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-03-11SenateSecond reading
2020-03-11SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-02-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2019-03-27SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-02-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF1246 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Author added Cantrell

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF1098&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1098&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1098&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1098&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1098&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF1098&version=4&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=5810
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF1098&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10566

Bill Comments

feedback