MN SF1420 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revisor's bill
Title
Revisor's bill
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 298 | |
2012-05-14 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-05-11 | Presented to Governor | |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Third reading vote: 62-1 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-05-09 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 126-2 |
2012-05-09 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-05-09 | House | Amended |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported to the House |
2012-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Committee report, to pass |
2011-05-21 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2011-05-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 62-0 |
2011-05-21 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |