MN SF1443 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Soil and water conservation districts funding authorization
Title
Soil and water conservation districts funding authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Taxes |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1284 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Author added Brand