MN SF1621 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 177 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 177 04/18/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child care accrediting organizations standards requirements, application and approval process development
Title
Child care accrediting organizations standards requirements, application and approval process development
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kruse [R] | Sen. David Hann [R] | Sen. Ted Lillie [R] | Rep. Joyce Peppin [R] |
Rep. Duane Quam [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Passage (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 177 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-20 | Governor's action Approval 04/18/12 | |
2012-04-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2012-04-05 | House | Bill was passed vote: 116-3 |
2012-04-05 | House | Third reading |
2012-04-05 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-30 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2097 |
2012-03-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 63-0 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2012-03-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Education |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2012-01-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |