MN SF2334 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 251 04/30/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Secretary of State Chapter 251 04/30/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lobbyists principal disclosure reporting requirements for large energy facilities spending activities
Title
Lobbyists principal disclosure reporting requirements for large energy facilities spending activities
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Vandeveer [R] | Sen. Katie Sieben [D] | Sen. John Harrington [D] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] |
Rep. Joyce Peppin [R] | Rep. Michael Beard [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 126 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 60 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - House - Amendment (Y: 60 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Secretary of State Chapter 251 04/30/12 | |
2012-04-30 | Governor's action Approval 04/30/12 | |
2012-04-26 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 126-1 |
2012-04-26 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-26 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-26 | House | Conference committee report |
2012-04-26 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 61-0 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Third reading vote: 61-0 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report |
2012-04-19 | House | House conferees Peppin, Beard, Nelson |
2012-04-19 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2012-04-19 | House | Senate conferees Vandeveer, Limmer, Sieben |
2012-04-19 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-19 | Senate | House conferees Peppin; Beard; Nelson |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Vandeveer; Limmer; Sieben |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-04-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 131-1 |
2012-04-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-17 | House | Amended |
2012-04-17 | House | Amendments offered |
2012-04-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2684 |
2012-03-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-0 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Special Order |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Local Government and Elections |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |