MN SF2582 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF817
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF817
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Interfering with point-of-sale terminals, gas pump dispensers and automated teller machines crime establishment
Title
Interfering with point-of-sale terminals, gas pump dispensers and automated teller machines crime establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF817 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Author added Hall |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF817 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 123 05/08/18