MN SF2770 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF substituted in committee HF2796
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HF substituted in committee HF2796
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota law enforcement association labor agreement and Minnesota state board of investment salary administration compensation plan ratification
Title
Minnesota law enforcement association labor agreement and Minnesota state board of investment salary administration compensation plan ratification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | HF substituted in committee HF2796 |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-05-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2796 (Similar To) 2020-05-17 - Third reading Passed as amended