MN SF3813 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Secretary of State Chapter 66 03/10/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

COVID-19 public health response planning and preparation and federal funds appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 public health response planning and preparation and federal funds appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: S.F. NO. 3813 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11 Secretary of State Chapter 66 03/10/2020
2020-03-11 Governor's action Approval 03/10/2020
2020-03-10 Governor approval
2020-03-10 Presented to Governor
2020-03-09HouseBill was passed as amended
2020-03-09HouseThird reading as amended
2020-03-09HouseAmended
2020-03-09HouseSecond reading
2020-03-09HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2020-03-09HouseMotion prevailed
2020-03-09HouseMotion to suspend rules
2020-03-09HouseSenate file first reading
2020-03-09HouseReceived from Senate
2020-03-09SenateThird reading
2020-03-09SenateSenate concurred and repassed bill
2020-03-09SenateReturned from House with amendment
2020-03-09SenateThird reading Passed
2020-03-09SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-03-05SenateSecond reading
2020-03-05SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-03-02SenateReferred to Finance
2020-03-02SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF4275 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Authors added Moran and Becker-Finn

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=Senate&f=SF3813&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3813&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3813&version=1&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3813&version=2&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=SF3813&version=3&session=ls91&session_year=2020&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=SF3813&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10515
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=5360
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mn/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls91&number=5359

Bill Comments

feedback