MN SF4495 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Authors added Boldon; Morrison
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Authors added Boldon; Morrison
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Certain surgical procedures being performed on patients under the age of 12 with certain exceptions prohibition and health-related licensing board disciplinary action authorization
Title
Certain surgical procedures being performed on patients under the age of 12 with certain exceptions prohibition and health-related licensing board disciplinary action authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Authors added Boldon; Morrison |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4964 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Author added Smith