MN SF5133 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human services forecast adjustments
Title
Human services forecast adjustments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4980 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means