MO HB1 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding state employee retirement systems
Title
Changes the laws regarding state employee retirement systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-19 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-19 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-07-14 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-07-14 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-07-14 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-07-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-07-14 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute (S) | |
2010-07-14 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2010-07-14 | Conference Committee Substitute (S) | |
2010-07-14 | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2010-07-14 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2010-07-14 | House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute (H) | |
2010-07-14 | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2010-07-13 | Conference Committee Substitute (H) | |
2010-07-13 | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2010-07-13 | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) | |
2010-07-13 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) | |
2010-07-13 | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) | |
2010-07-13 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2010-07-07 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2010-07-01 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-07-01 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-07-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-06-30 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-06-30 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-06-30 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-06-30 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-06-30 | Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S) | |
2010-06-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-06-29 | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) | |
2010-06-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2010-06-29 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2010-06-29 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-06-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-06-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-06-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-06-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-06-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-06-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-06-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-06-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-06-25 | Referred: Retirement (H) | |
2010-06-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-06-24 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |